This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/04/2022 at 11:23:54 (UTC).

GARZA-MELCHOR, MARTHA vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 GARZA-MELCHOR, MARTHA filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3407

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARZA-MELCHOR, MARTHA

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN BANKS

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS

1200 Travis 16Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker St

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FUNK, ADAM TAL

MA, QUOC-BAO DI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • HearingCourt: 129; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR); Results: Passed; Comments: AGREED ORDER SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS PASSED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SCOTT, MEAGAN THERESE; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 1/21/2022; Tracking: 73962073; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 1/21/2022; Tracking: 73962072; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 1/21/2022; Tracking: 73962071; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN BANKS; Issued: 1/21/2022; Tracking: 73962070; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 1/21/2022; Tracking: 73962069; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE; Issued: 1/21/2022; Tracking: 73962067; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 1/20/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FUNK, ADAM TAL; Person Filing: GARZA-MELCHOR, MARTHA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE is a litigant