This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/17/2019 at 07:36:55 (UTC).

GARZA, MARIA DELFINA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF vs. BOBCAT OF HOUSTON

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 GARZA, MARIA DELFINA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against BOBCAT OF HOUSTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9076

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARZA, MARIA DELFINA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF

GARZA, DAVID NICOLAS

GARZA, RICARDO RAUL

Defendants

BOBCAT OF HOUSTON

CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY (D/B/A BOBCAT COMPANY)

BOBCAT COMPANY

FECON INC

Others

CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY (D/B/A BOBCAT COMPANY) (A FOREIGN

FECON INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) BY SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED

BOBCAT OF HOUSTON (DIVISION OF BERRY COMPANIES) (A FOREIGN

FECON INC (FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING THE SECRETARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTANEDA, CHRYSTA L.

 

Court Documents

Citation Corporate

09/30/2019: Citation Corporate

Answer

10/01/2019: Answer

Citation Corporate

10/01/2019: Citation Corporate

Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

10/03/2019: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

Letter to Clerk

10/08/2019: Letter to Clerk

Letter Requesting Citation

10/11/2019: Letter Requesting Citation

Citation Corporate

10/14/2019: Citation Corporate

PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

09/23/2019: PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CASTANEDA, CHRYSTA L.; Person Filing: GARZA, RICARDO RAUL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CASTANEDA, CHRYSTA L.; Person Filing: GARZA, DAVID NICOLAS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CASTANEDA, CHRYSTA L.; Person Filing: GARZA, MARIA DELFINA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: FECON INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) BY SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CASTANEDA, CHRYSTA L.; Person Filing: GARZA, RICARDO RAUL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CASTANEDA, CHRYSTA L.; Person Filing: GARZA, DAVID NICOLAS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CASTANEDA, CHRYSTA L.; Person Filing: GARZA, MARIA DELFINA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fecon, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BOBCAT INC. VALLEY is a litigant

Latest cases where CLERK EQUIPMENT COMPANY is a litigant