This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:02:19 (UTC).

GARZA, HERMILO SR vs. AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA L P

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 GARZA, HERMILO SR filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA L P. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7725

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

GARZA, HERMILO SR

WGW SAFETY CORPORATION

WILLSON SAFETY PRODUCTS

KELCO SALES & ENGINEERING COMPANY

PULMOSAN SAFETY EQUIPMENT CORPORATION

WEDRON SILICA COMPANY INC

BACOU-DALLOZ SAFETY INC (FKA DALLOZ SAFETY INC FKA WGM SAFETY

DALLOZ SAFETY INC

AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA L P

AEARO COMPANY

AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA CORPORATION

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

BACOU-DALLOZ SAFETY INC (FKA WGW SAFETY CORPORATION DBA WILLSON

INCO SAFETY PRODUCTS

BIG THREE INDUSTRIES INC

BOB SCHMIDT INC

BOWTO INC (FKA BOWEN TOOLS INC)

BOWEN TOOLS INC

CEL INDUSTRIES INC

CLEMCO INDUSTRIES CORPORATION

57 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MARTIN, KIRK E.

MANNING, JACK B.

BEASON, RYAN A

OLSON, KIM M.

SHAVER, JEFFERY J

POWERS, JAMES H.

FULTZ, JEFFREY PIERCE

MACDONALD, DAVID M.

LEWIS, MARK E.

LEWIS, MARK EDWYNN

Other Attorneys

WARE, JAMES L.

OXFORD, HUBERT III

DODSON, JOE MICHAEL

TAYLOR, THOMAS B.

WILLIAMS, MICHAEL D.

PARKER, JERRY CLYDE

GEER, EVA D.

ROBERTS, JEFFREY D.

RUSSELL, STEVEN L.

NEWMAN, DEBORAH A.

1 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2014
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2011
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2006
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SHAVER, JEFFERY J Person Filing - WEDRON SILICA COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - LAYMAN, DAVID M. Person Filing - EMPIRE ABRASIVE EQUIPMENT COMPANY L P (AKA WOODFIELD GROUP INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - HENNESSY, EDWARD J. Person Filing - THORSTENBERG MATERIALS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - GEER, EVA D. Person Filing - PAULI & GIFFIN COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - ORETSKY, ANDREW S. Person Filing - SCHMIDT MANUFACTURING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - ORETSKY, ANDREW S. Person Filing - BOB SCHMIDT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - HENNESSY, EDWARD J. Person Filing - THORSTENBERG MATERIALS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ORETSKY, ANDREW S. Person Filing - BOB SCHMIDT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HENNESSY, EDWARD J. Person Filing - THORSTENBERG MATERIALS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PARRON, DAVID D. Person Filing - GARZA, HERMILO SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2002
  • PLEA JURISDICTION : Filing Attorney - OLSON, KIM M. Person Filing - PULMOSAN SAFETY EQUIPMENT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less