This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/24/2018 at 03:27:50 (UTC).

GARNER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC vs. IMPACT MIDSTREAM LLC

Case Summary

On 03/08/2016 GARNER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against IMPACT MIDSTREAM LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL LANDRUM. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5159

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL LANDRUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARNER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC

1717 W 13Th

Deer Park, TX 77536

Defendants

RINCON, GREGORY

Pearland, TX 77581-5674

IMPACT MIDSTREAM LLC

Other

IMPACT MIDSTREAM LLC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RISNER, BOBBIE K.

RIDDLE, TODD ARLIS

1221 Lamar St 1

Houston, TX 77010

Defendant Attorney

RINCON, GREGORY

1702 Glen Falls Lane

Pearland, TX 77581-5674

 

Court Documents

Citation (Gregory Rincon)

04/13/2016: Citation (Gregory Rincon)

VERIFICATION

05/02/2016: VERIFICATION

Filing letter

08/12/2016: Filing letter

Exhibit A

08/12/2016: Exhibit A

Filing letter

11/16/2016: Filing letter

Plaintiffs Second Notice of Re-Set for Submission of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment

12/16/2016: Plaintiffs Second Notice of Re-Set for Submission of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment

Demand for Oral Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment/Notice of hearing

01/31/2017: Demand for Oral Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment/Notice of hearing

Notice of Hearing

02/06/2017: Notice of Hearing

Cover letter

02/10/2017: Cover letter

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

02/13/2017: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

Exhibit 07

03/03/2017: Exhibit 07

Exhibit 03

03/03/2017: Exhibit 03

GARNER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.'S Certificate of Written Discovery served upon IMPACT MIDSTREAM, LLC and GREGORY RINCON, Individually

03/08/2017: GARNER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.'S Certificate of Written Discovery served upon IMPACT MIDSTREAM, LLC and GREGORY RINCON, Individually

ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

03/13/2017: ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER

05/04/2017: TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER

proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Continuance

05/11/2017: proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Continuance

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

12/05/2017: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

Proposed Order on Garner Environmental Services, Inc.'s Motion for Substitution of Counsel

10/03/2018: Proposed Order on Garner Environmental Services, Inc.'s Motion for Substitution of Counsel

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD; Order Signed: 10/5/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE; Order Signed: 12/4/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE; Order Signed: 5/12/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Order Signed: 3/13/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Description: MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARD, NO RULING;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RINCON, GREGORY; Person Filing: IMPACT MIDSTREAM LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RINCON, GREGORY; Person Filing: RINCON, GREGORY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Description: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE; Order Signed: 2/10/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Description: MOTION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Description: SUPPLEMENTAL FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RISNER, BOBBIE K.; Person Filing: GARNER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RISNER, BOBBIE K.; Person Filing: GARNER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATE EXPEDITED TRIAL READY GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RINCON, GREGORY; Person Filing: IMPACT MIDSTREAM LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RINCON, GREGORY; Person Filing: RINCON, GREGORY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RISNER, BOBBIE K.; Person Filing: GARNER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less