Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/09/2015 at 17:17:13 (UTC).

GARCIA, CONCEPCION vs. AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA LP

Case Summary

On 12/14/2005 GARCIA, CONCEPCION filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA LP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8396

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

EASTERN SAFETY EQUIPMENT CO INC

PULMOSAN SAFETY EQUIPMENT CORPORATION

GARCIA, CONCEPCION

GARCIA, GONZALO A

PARRA, ANSELMO

PARRA, JOSE ARNOLDO

ROBLES, BARTOLO

LOPEZ, JORGE R

AEARO COMPANY

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

BACOU-DALLOZ SAFETY INC (FKA WGM SAFETY CORPORATION DBA WILLSON

WGM SAFETY CORPORATION

WILLSON SAFETY PRODUCTS

BOB SCHMIDT INC

CLEMCO INDUSTRIES CORPORATION

DRESSER INDUSTRIES

E D BULLARD COMPANY

EL PASO SAND & TRUCKING INC

EMPIRE ABRASIVE EQUIPMENT COMPANY L P

ENCON SAFETY PRODUCTS INC

58 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

CASTRO, JOAQUIN

STERLING, DEBORAH L.

STECKLER, BRUCE W.

MARTIN, KIRK E.

POWERS, JAMES H.

MANNING, JACK B.

ORETSKY, ANDREW S.

GAULT, EDWIN SPIVEY JR.

CARLTON, GEORGE READ JR.

BRYANT, STEVE A.

BRITTAIN, ERIC MICHAEL

O'NEAL, SHANNON

BRILL, DAVID SMITH

Other Attorneys

DAWSON, CARL RAPIER

OXFORD, HUBERT III

PHILLIPS, CLINTON EUGENE

TAYLOR, THOMAS B.

DODSON, JOE MICHAEL

HENNESSY, EDWARD J.

TARDY, THOMAS W. III

23 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2015
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION-SILICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION-SILICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION-SILICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION-SILICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION-SILICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION-SILICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2006
  • ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STECKLER, BRUCE W. Person Filing - LOPEZ, JORGE R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STECKLER, BRUCE W. Person Filing - GARCIA, GONZALO A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STECKLER, BRUCE W. Person Filing - ROBLES, BARTOLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STECKLER, BRUCE W. Person Filing - GARCIA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STECKLER, BRUCE W. Person Filing - PARRA, ANSELMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STECKLER, BRUCE W. Person Filing - PARRA, JOSE ARNOLDO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENCON SAFETY PRODUCTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CLEMCO INDUSTRIES CORPORATION is a litigant