This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/06/2021 at 07:53:04 (UTC).

GARCIA, BREANNA MARIE vs. BRANDT COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 GARCIA, BREANNA MARIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRANDT COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRITTANYE MORRIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1520

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BRITTANYE MORRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA, BREANNA MARIE

Defendants

BRANDT COMPANY LLC

GONZALEZ, SALVADOR

Houston, TX 77064

Other

BRANDT COMPANY LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

1728 Briercroft Ct

Carrollton, TX 75006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLINGSWORTH, STEVEN RYAN

 

Court Documents

Service Request for Gonzalez

04/12/2021: Service Request for Gonzalez

Service Request Brandt Company

04/12/2021: Service Request Brandt Company

Plaintiffs Original Petition

04/12/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw As Counsel For Plaintiff, Breanna Marie Garcia

04/16/2021: Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw As Counsel For Plaintiff, Breanna Marie Garcia

Notice of Hearing

04/16/2021: Notice of Hearing

Exhibit D

04/16/2021: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

04/16/2021: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

04/16/2021: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

04/16/2021: Exhibit A

Motion to Withdraw As Counsel For Plaintiff, Breanna Marie Garcia

04/16/2021: Motion to Withdraw As Counsel For Plaintiff, Breanna Marie Garcia

Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff, Breanna Marie Garcia

04/22/2021: Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff, Breanna Marie Garcia

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD; Requesting Party: HOLLINGSWORTH, STEVEN RYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GONZALEZ, SALVADOR; Issued: 4/13/2021; Tracking: 73859650; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BRANDT COMPANY LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 4/13/2021; Tracking: 73859647; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOLLINGSWORTH, STEVEN RYAN; Person Filing: GARCIA, BREANNA MARIE;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRANDT AS TRUSTEE OF THE BARBARA BRANDT 2011 VALLEY TRUST AND AS TRUST AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE SUPERSTEIN GST EXEMPT TRUST FBO BARBARA BRANDT BARBARA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLLINGSWORTH, STEVEN R.