This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/30/2021 at 07:21:30 (UTC).

GARCIA, AUBREY vs. SCOREMORE LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 GARCIA, AUBREY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SCOREMORE LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JERALYNN MANOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9066

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JERALYNN MANOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA, AUBREY

Defendants

SCOREMORE LLC

SCOREMORE HOLDINGS LLC

SCOREMORE MGMT LLC

AEG FACILITIES LLC

ONEX CORPORATION (CANADIAN CORPORATION)

SMG HOLDINGS LLC

ASM GLOBAL LLC

ASM GLOBAL PARENT INC

EIGHTEENTWENTYSIX LLC

CACTUS JACK RECORDS LLC

WEBSTER, JACQUES (II) (A/K/A SCOTT, TRAVIS)

Cypress, TX 77429

HARRIS COUNTY SPORTS & CONVENTION CORPORATION

NRG ENERGY INC

Others

SCOREMORE LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS

5704 W Hwy 290

Austin, TX 78735

SCOREMORE HOLDINGS LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING

5444 Westheimer #1000

Houston, TX 77056

SCOREMORE MGMT LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS

5704 W Hwy 290

Austin, TX 78735

AEG FACILITIES LLC (LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS

2710 Gateway Oaks Drive Suite 150N

Sacramento, CA 95833

SMG HOLDINGS LLC (LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

ASM GLOBAL LLC (LIMITED LIABI8LITTY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZ, MUHAMMAD SULEIMAN

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PARTIAL NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE:

12/09/2021: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PARTIAL NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE:

PROPOSED ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE:

12/09/2021: PROPOSED ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE:

Plaintiff's Original Petition

12/06/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Request for Issuance of Service

12/06/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Notice to the Court of Filing of Motion to Transfer Under Rule 13, Rules of Judicial Administration (Notice of MDL Filing)

12/29/2021: Notice to the Court of Filing of Motion to Transfer Under Rule 13, Rules of Judicial Administration (Notice of MDL Filing)

ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

12/10/2021: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 12/10/2021;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NRG ENERGY INC (FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 12/9/2021; Tracking: 73950534; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SPORTS & CONVENTION CORPORATION (FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION); Issued: 12/9/2021; Tracking: 73950533; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CACTUS JACK RECORDS LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING; Issued: 12/9/2021; Tracking: 73950532; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: EIGHTEENTWENTYSIX LLC (LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 12/9/2021; Tracking: 73950531; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ASM GLOBAL PARENT INC (FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 12/9/2021; Tracking: 73950529; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ASM GLOBAL LLC (LIMITED LIABI8LITTY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 12/9/2021; Tracking: 73950528; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SMG HOLDINGS LLC (LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 12/9/2021; Tracking: 73950527; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AEG FACILITIES LLC (LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 12/9/2021; Tracking: 73950525; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SCOREMORE MGMT LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 12/9/2021; Tracking: 73950522; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SCOREMORE HOLDINGS LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING; Issued: 12/9/2021; Tracking: 73950521; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SCOREMORE LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 12/9/2021; Tracking: 73950519; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WEBSTER, JACQUES (II) (A/K/A SCOTT, TRAVIS); Issued: 12/9/2021; Tracking: 73950518; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (NON-RESIDENT CORPORATE); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ONEX CORPORATION (CANADIAN CORPORATION); Issued: 12/9/2021; Tracking: 73950517; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AZIZ, MUHAMMAD SULEIMAN; Person Filing: GARCIA, AUBREY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EIGHTEENTWENTYSIX LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SMG HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CACTUS JACK RECORDS LLC is a litigant