This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/27/2023 at 07:22:30 (UTC).

GAMBLE, ROBERT vs. CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 GAMBLE, ROBERT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0037

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAMBLE, ROBERT

Defendant

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RHODES, ERIC L

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

01/03/2023: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

01/03/2023: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

Plaintiffs Original Petition Application for Injunctive Relief and Request for Disclosures

01/03/2023: Plaintiffs Original Petition Application for Injunctive Relief and Request for Disclosures

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • HearingCourt: 152; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingCourt: 215; Docket Type: Ancillary Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (MOTION FOR); Results: Granted; Comments: O/S 1/3/2022; Requesting Party: RHODES, ERIC L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 1/3/2023;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RHODES, ERIC L; Person Filing: GAMBLE, ROBERT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 1/3/2023;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 1/3/2023;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less