This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/04/2019 at 21:58:04 (UTC).

GALO, YESLY DAYANA vs. 316 CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 GALO, YESLY DAYANA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 316 CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are BRENT GAMBLE and DEDRA DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9875

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

BRENT GAMBLE

DEDRA DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALO, YESLY

Houston, TX 77084

GALO, YESLY DAYANA

Houston, TX 77084

Defendants

316 CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC

555 Republic Dr Ste 200

Plano, TX 75074-5469

5 ARCH FUNDING CORP

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

LEWIS, HENRY D

INTERNATIONAL CITY MORTGAGE INC (DBA DOORWAY HOME LOANS) (A CALIFORNIA

3610-2 North Josey Lane Suite 223

Carrollton, TX 75007

SABBAGH, SAID

Addison, TX 75001

DOORWAY HOME LOANS

RELIANT TITLE USA LLC

Others

5 ARCH FUNDING

BUGGS, LADELE A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, ROCHELLE DIANNE

2909 Hillcroft

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

Verification

12/10/2018: Verification

Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

12/10/2018: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

Notice of Hearing for Temporary Injunction

12/13/2018: Notice of Hearing for Temporary Injunction

Civil Process Request

11/15/2018: Civil Process Request

Civil Process Request

11/15/2018: Civil Process Request

Civil Process Request

11/15/2018: Civil Process Request

Civil Process Request

11/15/2018: Civil Process Request

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

11/20/2018: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Verification

11/05/2018: Verification

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order

11/05/2018: Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order

Exhibit E

11/05/2018: Exhibit E

Exhibit D

11/05/2018: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

11/05/2018: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

11/05/2018: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

11/05/2018: Exhibit A

Civil Case Information Sheet

11/05/2018: Civil Case Information Sheet

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

11/06/2018: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

11/06/2018: Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER DENIED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 11/6/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 11/6/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 11/6/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DAVIS, ROCHELLE DIANNE; Person Filing: GALO, YESLY DAYANA;

    Read MoreRead Less