This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/04/2019 at 22:07:33 (UTC).

GALO, SANTANO ALBERTO vs. 316 CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 GALO, SANTANO ALBERTO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 316 CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ALEXANDRA SMOOTS-THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9987

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ALEXANDRA SMOOTS-THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALO, SANTANO ALBERTO

Houston, TX 77084

Defendants

316 CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC

555 Republic Dr Ste 200

Plano, TX 75074-5469

BUGS, LADELE A

Plano, TX 75074

LEWIS, HENRY D

Addison, TX 75001

INTERNATIONAL CITY MORTGAGE INC (DBA DOORWAY HOME LOANS)

15851 N Dallas Parkway Suite 1110

Addison, TX 75001

DOORWAY HOMES LOANS

5 ARCH FUNDING CORP

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

SABBAGH, SAID

Addison, TX 75001

RELIANT TITLE USA LLC

15851 North Dallas Pkwy Suite 180

Addison, TX 75001

DOORWAY HOME LOANS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, ROCHELLE DIANNE

2909 Hillcroft

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

11/28/2018: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

11/28/2018: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

NOTICE TO EXTEND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER HEARING

12/07/2018: NOTICE TO EXTEND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER HEARING

Proposed Order for Temporary Injunction

12/07/2018: Proposed Order for Temporary Injunction

Civil Process Request

11/15/2018: Civil Process Request

Civil Process Process

11/15/2018: Civil Process Process

PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

11/19/2018: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Verification

11/05/2018: Verification

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order

11/05/2018: Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order

Exhibit E

11/05/2018: Exhibit E

Exhibit D

11/05/2018: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

11/05/2018: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

11/05/2018: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

11/05/2018: Exhibit A

Civil Case Information Sheet

11/05/2018: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiff's Original Verified Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

11/05/2018: Plaintiff's Original Verified Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

11/06/2018: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

11/06/2018: Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • Description: ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 11/27/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 11/27/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 11/6/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 11/6/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 11/6/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DAVIS, ROCHELLE DIANNE; Person Filing: GALO, SANTANO ALBERTO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Description: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 11/27/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less