This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/24/2018 at 00:21:49 (UTC).

GALLIEN, JOSEPH (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ASSIGNEES) vs. WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE INC

Case Summary

On 01/20/2016 GALLIEN, JOSEPH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ASSIGNEES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY WILSON. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3468

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY WILSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALLIEN, ADRIENNE (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ASSIGNEES)

GALLIEN, JOSEPH (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ASSIGNEES)

Defendants

WELLS FARGO BANK N A

NINO, CRISTOBAL (INDIVIDUALLY)

Freindswood, TX 77546

WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE INC

ORSAK, KATHY

Austin, TX 75001

NINO, VERONICA (DECEASED)

NINO, CRISTOBAL (AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF VERONICA NINO)

Friendswood, TX 77546

Others

WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE INC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

WELLS FARGO BANK N A MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALL, BENJAMIN LEWIS III

Defendant Attorneys

CARSON, DERRICK BRYAN

BURTON, THOMAS H.

BURTON, THOMAS H. III

MAUS, MICHAEL CLIFTON

 

Court Documents

Exhibit 7

01/20/2016: Exhibit 7

Exhibit 6

01/20/2016: Exhibit 6

Exhibit 2

01/20/2016: Exhibit 2

Exhibit 1

01/20/2016: Exhibit 1

Civil Process Request Form

01/20/2016: Civil Process Request Form

Plaintiff's Original Petition

01/20/2016: Plaintiff's Original Petition

ORDER SIGNED DENYING TRANSFER OF CASE TO ANOTHER DIST COURT

01/25/2016: ORDER SIGNED DENYING TRANSFER OF CASE TO ANOTHER DIST COURT

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7014 1820 0001 6307 5360

01/28/2016: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7014 1820 0001 6307 5360

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7014 1820 0001 6307 5353

01/28/2016: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7014 1820 0001 6307 5353

Domestic Return Receipt

02/05/2016: Domestic Return Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

02/08/2016: Domestic Return Receipt

Exhibit A

02/10/2016: Exhibit A

Defendant Cristobal Nino's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

02/10/2016: Defendant Cristobal Nino's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

Exhibit A

02/17/2016: Exhibit A

Notice of Intent to File Stolen Funds in the Registry of the Court

02/17/2016: Notice of Intent to File Stolen Funds in the Registry of the Court

Proposed Order

05/05/2016: Proposed Order

Kathy Orsak's Motion to Quash Deposition

05/05/2016: Kathy Orsak's Motion to Quash Deposition

First Court of Appeals

07/28/2017: First Court of Appeals

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2017
  • Description: ORD SGND GRANTING MTN TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED DENYING PLEA TO JURISDICTION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Description: ORDER GRANTING SANCTIONS SIGNED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Description: NO COSTS ALLOCATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Description: ORDER DISBURSING REGISTRY FUNDS SIGNED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING;

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2016
  • Description: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/21/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CARSON, DERRICK BRYAN; Person Filing: WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MAUS, MICHAEL CLIFTON; Person Filing: ORSAK, KATHY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CARSON, DERRICK BRYAN; Person Filing: WELLS FARGO BANK N A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURTON, THOMAS H. III; Person Filing: NINO, CRISTOBAL (INDIVIDUALLY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED DENYING TRANSFER OF CASE TO ANOTHER DIST COURT; Order Signed: 1/25/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HALL, BENJAMIN LEWIS III; Person Filing: GALLIEN, ADRIENNE (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ASSIGNEES);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HALL, BENJAMIN LEWIS III; Person Filing: GALLIEN, JOSEPH (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ASSIGNEES);

    Read MoreRead Less