This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:16:42 (UTC).

GALINDO, BRENDA vs. DANG, AN

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 GALINDO, BRENDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANG, AN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1330

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALINDO, BRENDA

Defendant

DANG, AN

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLUM, JAMES JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Return of Service

06/11/2020: Return of Service

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request For Disclosure

05/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request For Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: DANG, AN; Issued: 5/26/2020; Served: 6/10/2020; Tracking: 73752535; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COLLUM, JAMES JOSHUA; Person Filing: GALINDO, BRENDA;

    Read MoreRead Less