This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/20/2021 at 07:35:56 (UTC).

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. ZPA CORPORATION (DBA BATTERIES PLUS BULBS)

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ZPA CORPORATION DBA BATTERIES PLUS BULBS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5385

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY WATER CONTROL AND IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT # 36

Defendants

ZPA CORPORATION (DBA BATTERIES PLUS BULBS)

BATTERIES PLUS BULBS

Other

ZPA CORPORATION (DBA BATTERIES PLUS BULBS) BY SERVING ITS

1727 Talcott Lane Sugar

Land, TX 77479

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAILEY, JASON LANE

 

Court Documents

Citation

08/12/2021: Citation

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit - ZPA

07/27/2021: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit - ZPA

Plaintiffs Original Petition

07/27/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ZPA CORPORATION (DBA BATTERIES PLUS BULBS) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 7/27/2021; Served: 8/5/2021; Tracking: 73894919; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON LANE; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY WATER CONTROL AND IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT # 36;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON LANE; Person Filing: GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harris County Water Control and Improvement District Number 109 is a litigant

Latest cases where GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAILEY, JASON L.