This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/22/2018 at 18:56:14 (UTC).

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. MAAA ENTERPRISES INC (D/B/A CLINTON FOOD MART)

Case Summary

On 03/03/2016 GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against MAAA ENTERPRISES INC D/B/A CLINTON FOOD MART. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRENT GAMBLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4012

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BRENT GAMBLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

1235 North Loop West

Houston, TX 77008

Defendants and Intervenor Plaintiffs

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

CITY OF HOUSTON

HARRIS COUNTY

CITY OF GALENA PARK

M.A.A.A. ENTERPRISES, INC., D/B/A CLINTON FOOD MAR

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (IN REM ONLY)

1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

MAAA ENTERPRISES INC (D/B/A CLINTON FOOD MART)

4107 Angel Spring Drive

Sugar Land, TX 77479

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (IN REM ONLY)

1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

M A A A ENTERPRISES INC (DBA CLINTON FOOD MART)

MAAA ENTERPRISES INC (D/B/A CLINTON FOOD MART)

4107 Angel Spring Drive

Sugar Land, TX 77479

Others

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS

MAAA ENTERPRISES INC (D/B/A CLINTON FOOD MART) BY SERVING ITS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAILEY, JASON L.

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH

EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN

EAST, ROBERT GREGORY

 

Court Documents

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

03/03/2016: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

03/03/2016: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

ORIGINAL PETITION IN INTERVENTION

03/15/2016: ORIGINAL PETITION IN INTERVENTION

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

05/16/2016: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Original Intervention

07/08/2016: Original Intervention

Original Intervention

07/26/2016: Original Intervention

PROPOSED MASTER IN CHANCERYS REPORT TO THE DISTRICT COURT

09/20/2016: PROPOSED MASTER IN CHANCERYS REPORT TO THE DISTRICT COURT

PROPOESED ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY IN CHARGE

09/20/2016: PROPOESED ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY IN CHARGE

NOTICE OF TRIAL/DEFAULT HEARING

12/20/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL/DEFAULT HEARING

MAIL MANIFEST

02/20/2017: MAIL MANIFEST

DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED

05/18/2017: DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED

Request for Writ of Execution

10/23/2017: Request for Writ of Execution

Request for Writ of Execution

10/23/2017: Request for Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution Return

12/13/2017: Writ of Execution Return

Return Writ of Exectuion

05/29/2018: Return Writ of Exectuion

Proposed Master In Chancerys Report To The District Court

08/24/2018: Proposed Master In Chancerys Report To The District Court

Notice Of Hearing

08/24/2018: Notice Of Hearing

City of Galena Park Independents Motion For Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc

08/24/2018: City of Galena Park Independents Motion For Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2017
  • Description: DEFENDANT COSTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/18/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Description: ORDER SGND GRANTING SALE OF PROPERTY; Order Signed: 5/18/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2017
  • Description: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2017
  • Description: DEFAULT RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Description: AWAITING TAX MASTER RECOMMENDATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • Description: EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • Description: TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD; Order Signed: 11/29/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Description: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: DEFOYD, JIMMY L.; Person Filing: CITY OF GALENA PARK;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: Not Downloaded;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Description: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH; Person Filing: SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON L.; Person Filing: GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.