Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/10/2021 at 18:29:20 (UTC).

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. HENRY, REGINALD JAMES ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS SUCCESSORS OR ASSIGNS OR OTHER

Case Summary

On 03/03/2016 GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HENRY, REGINALD JAMES ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS SUCCESSORS OR ASSIGNS OR OTHER. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is URSULA A. HALL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3985

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

URSULA A. HALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenor Plaintiffs

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

1235 North Loop West

Houston, TX 77008

HARRIS COUNTY

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

CITY OF HOUSTON

Houston, TX 77253

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

CITY OF HOUSTON, NO SERVICE NECESSARY AT THIS TIME (IN REM ONLY)

Houston, TX 77002

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

HENRY, CAROLYN JACQUELINE

HENRY, REGINALD JAMES

CITY OF HOUSTON, NO SERVICE NECESSARY AT THIS TIME

HENRY, CLAYTON E.

HENRY, REGINALD JAMES ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS SUCCESSORS OR ASSIGNS OR OTHER

Houston, TX 77002

HENRY, REGINALD (AKA REGINALD JAMES HENRY) (DECEASED)

HENRY, CLAYTON E (IN REM ONLY)

Deerfield, FL 33443

CITY OF HOUSTON, NO SERVICE NECESSARY AT THIS TIME (IN REM ONLY)

Houston, TX 77002

HENRY, CAROLYN JACQUELINE (IN REM ONLY) (ALSO KNOWN AS CAROLYN JACKSON

Houston, TX 77004

Other

HENRY, CLAYTON E (IN REM ONLY) SERVICE THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF STATE

Deerfield Beach, FL 33443

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant and Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

BAILEY, JASON L.

1235 North Loop

Houston, TX 77008

BAILEY, JASON LANE

1235 North Loop

Houston, TX 77008

STONE, HERBERT ALONZO III

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN

Po Box 3064

Houston, TX 77253

SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH

11550 Fuqua, Sui

Houston, TX 77034

CLEVENGER, GEORGE T.

15219 Stuebner A

Houston, TX 77069

BAUMANN, RIECKE

Po Box 131647

Houston, TX 77219

 

Court Documents

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

03/03/2016: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

03/03/2016: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

DAILY COURT REVIEW

05/13/2016: DAILY COURT REVIEW

Proposed Order

07/11/2016: Proposed Order

SECRETARY OF STATE

07/20/2016: SECRETARY OF STATE

Notice of found Heir by Attorney Ad Litem

11/14/2016: Notice of found Heir by Attorney Ad Litem

Attorney Ad Litem's Answer

11/14/2016: Attorney Ad Litem's Answer

Notice of Hearing on Motion to Consolidate

11/18/2016: Notice of Hearing on Motion to Consolidate

Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion to Consolidate

11/22/2016: Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion to Consolidate

ALIAS CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

11/29/2016: ALIAS CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

Alias Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

12/15/2016: Alias Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Notice of Found Heir

07/24/2017: Notice of Found Heir

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/13/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED PETITION

09/19/2017: PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED PETITION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TRIAL / DEFAULT HEARING

09/27/2017: AMENDED NOTICE OF TRIAL / DEFAULT HEARING

EXHIBIT A- certified mail return receipt

09/28/2017: EXHIBIT A- certified mail return receipt

Proposed Tax Appointee Fee Report

02/16/2018: Proposed Tax Appointee Fee Report

Return mail undeliverable

05/21/2018: Return mail undeliverable

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketType of Service: ORDER OF SALE (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: EXECUTION ORDER OF SALE; Person: HENRY, REGINALD JAMES ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS SUCCESSORS OR ASSIGNS OR OTHER; Issued: 6/12/2018; Served: 10/2/2018; Returned: 11/2/2018; Tracking: 73504787; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/18/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: NO COSTS ALLOCATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: FEE AWARDED TO ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Order Signed: 5/9/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Order Signed: 5/9/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY); Order Signed: 5/9/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: FEE AWARDED TO ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Order Signed: 5/9/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2018
  • DocketDescription: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2018
  • DocketDescription: ATTORNEY FEES RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2018
  • DocketDescription: ATTORNEY FEES RECOMMENDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2016
  • HearingCourt: 555; Docket Type: Tax Docket (Trial); Reason: AD LITEM APPOINTMENT ATTORNEY; Results: Granted; Comments: RIECKE BAUMANN; Requesting Party: WIEHLE, ELIZABETH ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Person Filing: HENRY, CLAYTON E (IN REM ONLY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, DAMON DAWAIN; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON, NO SERVICE NECESSARY AT THIS TIME (IN REM ONLY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 6/21/2016; Returned: 6/27/2016; Tracking: 73259198; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH; Person Filing: SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HENRY, CLAYTON E (IN REM ONLY) SERVICE THROUGH THE SECRETARY OF STATE; Issued: 3/9/2016; Served: 5/10/2016; Tracking: 73224708; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Issued: 3/9/2016; Tracking: 73224707; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketType of Service: PUBLICATION (TAX); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HENRY, REGINALD JAMES ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS SUCCESSORS OR ASSIGNS OR OTHER; Issued: 3/9/2016; Served: 3/21/2016; Returned: 3/28/2016; Tracking: 73224706; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON LANE; Person Filing: GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH