This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/21/2021 at 07:26:14 (UTC).

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. GALICIA, JOSE M

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against GALICIA, JOSE M. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5741

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF HOUSTON

Defendant

GALICIA, JOSE M

Houston, TX 77020

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAILEY, JASON LANE

 

Court Documents

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

08/11/2021: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

07/28/2021: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

07/28/2021: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GALICIA, JOSE M; Issued: 7/28/2021; Served: 8/3/2021; Returned: 8/3/2021; Tracking: 73895513; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON LANE; Person Filing: CITY OF HOUSTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON LANE; Person Filing: GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAILEY, JASON L.