This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/11/2022 at 07:21:18 (UTC).

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. DICKENS, CANDICE M

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against DICKENS, CANDICE M. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6376

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

CITY OF GALENA PARK

Intervenor Plaintiff

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendant and Intervenor Defendant

DICKENS, CANDICE M

Park, TX 77547

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DARLOW, MICHAEL J.

BAILEY, JASON LANE

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

06/17/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

06/17/2022: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

ORIGINAL PETITION IN INTERVENTION

06/24/2022: ORIGINAL PETITION IN INTERVENTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH; Person Filing: SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: DICKENS, CANDICE M; Issued: 6/21/2022; Served: 6/28/2022; Returned: 6/29/2022; Received: 7/1/2022; Tracking: 74018497; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DARLOW, MICHAEL J.; Person Filing: GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON LANE; Person Filing: CITY OF GALENA PARK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH