This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/23/2021 at 07:22:25 (UTC).

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. CARMOUCHE, PRESTON

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against CARMOUCHE, PRESTON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8898

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT # 51

Defendants

CARMOUCHE, PRESTON

Houston, TX 77044

FIRST INSURANCE FUNDING CORP (IN REM ONLY)

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION (IN REM ONLY)

Others

FIRST INSURANCE FUNDING CORP (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

3821 Jiuniper Trace Suite 108

Austin, TX 78738

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA -SMALL BUSINESS ADMININSTRATION (IN REM ONLY)

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAILEY, JASON LANE

 

Court Documents

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

07/13/2021: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

07/16/2021: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

06/29/2021: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

06/29/2021: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

06/29/2021: Citation In Delinquent Tax Suit

Plaintiff's Original Petition

06/29/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CARMOUCHE, PRESTON; Issued: 6/29/2021; Served: 7/14/2021; Returned: 7/14/2021; Tracking: 73884994; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA -SMALL BUSINESS ADMININSTRATION (IN REM ONLY); Issued: 6/29/2021; Served: 7/16/2021; Returned: 7/19/2021; Tracking: 73884992; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FIRST INSURANCE FUNDING CORP (IN REM ONLY) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 6/29/2021; Tracking: 73884987; Deliver To: ATTORNEY PICK-UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON LANE; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT # 51;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON LANE; Person Filing: SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAILEY, JASON LANE; Person Filing: GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST INSURANCE FUNDING is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 is a litigant