This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:10:53 (UTC).

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT vs. ANY AND ALL APPARENT HEIRS TO THE ESTATE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ANY AND ALL APPARENT HEIRS TO THE ESTATE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0449

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

CITY OF HOUSTON

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY

ANY AND ALL APPARENT HEIRS TO THE ESTATE OF JESSE MACY (DECEASED)

STATE OF TEXAS

HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOYNER, DEXTER

LINEBARGER, GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON

PARMAR, PANKA J. R.

SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2006
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - CITY OF HOUSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - PARMAR, PANKA J. R. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH Person Filing - SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JOYNER, DEXTER Person Filing - GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less