This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:07:16 (UTC).

FUNES, JOSE ALIRIO vs. FUNES, SARA MARGARITA

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 FUNES, JOSE ALIRIO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FUNES, SARA MARGARITA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8049

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FUNES, JOSE ALIRIO

Defendant

FUNES, SARA MARGARITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CEVALLOS, LORETTA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED FOR PLAINTIFF (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CEVALLOS, LORETTA Person Filing - FUNES, JOSE ALIRIO

    Read MoreRead Less