This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/20/2021 at 07:49:28 (UTC).

FULLERTON, KELLING E vs. WMC MORTGAGE CORP (AKA WMC MORTGAGE LLC)

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 FULLERTON, KELLING E filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WMC MORTGAGE CORP AKA WMC MORTGAGE LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5441

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FULLERTON, KELLING E

Defendants

WMC MORTGAGE CORP (AKA WMC MORTGAGE LLC)

WMC MORTGAGE LLC

Other

WMC MORTGAGE CORP (AKA WMC MORTGAGE LLC) (FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY

2710 Gateway Oaks Drive Suite 150N

Sacramento, CA 95833

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOMLIN, JASON DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition In Suit To Quiet Title And Request For Declaratory Judgment

07/27/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition In Suit To Quiet Title And Request For Declaratory Judgment

Exhibit A

07/27/2021: Exhibit A

Exhibit B

07/27/2021: Exhibit B

Exhibit C

07/27/2021: Exhibit C

Exhibit D

07/27/2021: Exhibit D

Return of Service

08/09/2021: Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (NON-RESIDENT CORPORATE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WMC MORTGAGE CORP (AKA WMC MORTGAGE LLC) (FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY; Issued: 7/28/2021; Served: 8/2/2021; Received: 8/9/2021; Tracking: 73895063; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TOMLIN, JASON DOUGLAS; Person Filing: FULLERTON, KELLING E;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WMC MORTGAGE CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason D Tomlin