This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:11:40 (UTC).

FRANKLIN, JOHN F III vs. CLASSIC DENTAL LLC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 FRANKLIN, JOHN F III filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against CLASSIC DENTAL LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8481

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANKLIN, JOHN F III

Defendants

CLASSIC DENTAL LLC

JACKSON, L A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG, GREGG M.

Defendant Attorney

SMOOTS-HOGAN, ALEXANDRA ILANA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROSENBERG, GREGG M. Person Filing - FRANKLIN, JOHN F III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMOOTS-HOGAN, ALEXANDRA ILANA Person Filing - CLASSIC DENTAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMOOTS-HOGAN, ALEXANDRA ILANA Person Filing - JACKSON, L A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROSENBERG, GREGG M. Person Filing - FRANKLIN, JOHN F III

    Read MoreRead Less