This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:40:52 (UTC).

FRACHTMAN, RICHARD J (AS THE PROPERTY OW vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 FRACHTMAN, RICHARD J AS THE PROPERTY OW filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7379

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRACHTMAN, RICHARD J (AS THE PROPERTY OWNER)

FRACHTMAN, ANNE (AS THE PROPERTY OWNER)

PROPERTY OWNERS

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD OF HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKENNEY, HUGH L.

Defendant Attorney

ROBINSON, JAMES D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2005
  • PLAINTIFF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2004
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - ROBINSON, JAMES D. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKENNEY, HUGH L. Person Filing - PROPERTY OWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKENNEY, HUGH L. Person Filing - FRACHTMAN, ANNE (AS THE PROPERTY OWNER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKENNEY, HUGH L. Person Filing - FRACHTMAN, RICHARD J (AS THE PROPERTY OWNER)

    Read MoreRead Less