Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:36:37 (UTC).

FOY, GWENDOLYN vs. MAXEY, ERIN

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 FOY, GWENDOLYN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MAXEY, ERIN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOT DOLLINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9450

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SCOT DOLLINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOY, GWENDOLYN

Defendant

MAXEY, ERIN

Spring, TX 77379

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADSHAW-HULL, CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

LIU, ALICE

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt

04/06/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Domestic return receipt

04/13/2020: Domestic return receipt

Defendant Original Answer

04/30/2020: Defendant Original Answer

Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery

05/01/2020: Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 1130 0002 1905 8217

04/01/2020: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 1130 0002 1905 8217

Request for Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Plaintiff's Original Petition

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LIU, ALICE; Person Filing: MAXEY, ERIN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MAXEY, ERIN; Issued: 4/1/2020; Tracking: 73739598; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BRADSHAW-HULL, CHRISTOPHER; Person Filing: FOY, GWENDOLYN;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alice Liu