This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 07:27:45 (UTC).

FOREST POINT AT CYPRESSWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION vs. NEWTON, ANDRE J

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 FOREST POINT AT CYPRESSWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against NEWTON, ANDRE J. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DARYL L. MOORE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0071

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DARYL L. MOORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREST POINT AT CYPRESSWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

NEWTON, ANDRE J

Spring, TX 77373

NEWTON, TONYA S

Spring, TX 77373

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.

 

Court Documents

Affidavit Of Service

07/22/2020: Affidavit Of Service

Civil Process Request

07/07/2020: Civil Process Request

Civil Case Information Sheet

07/07/2020: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiff's Original Petition

07/07/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NEWTON, TONYA S; Issued: 7/10/2020; Tracking: 73766191; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NEWTON, ANDRE J; Issued: 7/10/2020; Served: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73766189; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.; Person Filing: FOREST POINT AT CYPRESSWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION;

    Read MoreRead Less