This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/09/2022 at 02:24:38 (UTC).

FIRST NATIONAL BANK TEXAS vs. VELASQUEZ, DINA ELSA

Case Summary

On 01/28/2022 FIRST NATIONAL BANK TEXAS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VELASQUEZ, DINA ELSA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RAVI K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5757

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RAVI K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST NATIONAL BANK TEXAS

Defendant

VELASQUEZ, DINA ELSA

Houston, TX 77014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUNNINGHAM, KRISTINA LOUISE

 

Court Documents

Return of Service (DINA ELSA VELASQUEZ)

02/07/2022: Return of Service (DINA ELSA VELASQUEZ)

Plaintiff's Original Petition

01/28/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Exhibits A

01/28/2022: Exhibits A

Exhibits B

01/28/2022: Exhibits B

Exhibits C

01/28/2022: Exhibits C

Request for Issuance of Service

01/28/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: VELASQUEZ, DINA ELSA; Issued: 1/31/2022; Served: 2/2/2022; Tracking: 73966604; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CUNNINGHAM, KRISTINA LOUISE; Person Filing: FIRST NATIONAL BANK TEXAS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First National Bank Texas is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristina L Cunningham