This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/01/2017 at 01:19:56 (UTC).

FIRST INDUSTRIAL TEXAS LP vs. SORBENTS MANUFACTURING LLC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2016 FIRST INDUSTRIAL TEXAS LP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SORBENTS MANUFACTURING LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2232

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST INDUSTRIAL TEXAS LP

Defendants

GRANER, CHRIS

Houston, TX 77020

CARGOWAYS LLC

165 Beal St.

Hingham, MA 02043

TEXAS CARGOWAYS (A SUBSIDIARY OF CARGOWAYS LLC)

Houston, TX 77020

SORBENTS MANUFACTURING LLC

CARGOWAYS LOGISTICS INC

CARGOWAYS LT LLC

555 Gellhorn

Houston, TX 77029

SORBENTS PLUS LLC

2816 Forest Point Drive

League City, TX 77573

DUMONT, GILLES

Houston, TX 77020

SNELL, ANGELA

League City, TX 77573

Others

SORBENTS PLUS LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING ITS

SORBENTS MANUFACTURING LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY

CARGOWAYS LOGISTICS INC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWELL, RICHARD T. JR.

Defendant Attorneys

HORN, ROBERT L

STEPHENS, JOSEPH BRENT

 

Court Documents

Exhibit 1

04/07/2016: Exhibit 1

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

04/07/2016: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition

04/26/2016: Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition

Letter enclosing Exhibits 1 & 2 to Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition

05/03/2016: Letter enclosing Exhibits 1 & 2 to Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition

Letter requesting citations of Defendants

07/11/2016: Letter requesting citations of Defendants

Citation

07/21/2016: Citation

Citation

07/21/2016: Citation

Citation

07/21/2016: Citation

Citation

07/26/2016: Citation

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment

07/28/2016: Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment

Notice of Oral Hearing

07/28/2016: Notice of Oral Hearing

Exhibit B

07/28/2016: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

07/28/2016: Exhibit A

Notice of Submission

12/09/2016: Notice of Submission

Exhibit 03

12/09/2016: Exhibit 03

Exhibit 01

12/09/2016: Exhibit 01

Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions

12/09/2016: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions

Exhibit 01

12/21/2016: Exhibit 01

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2016
  • Description: SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOWELL, RICHARD T. JR.; Person Filing: FIRST INDUSTRIAL TEXAS LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Description: ORD SGN GRNTNG PROTECTION FROM DISCOVERY REQUEST; Order Signed: 12/16/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Description: ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED; Order Signed: 9/19/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HORN, ROBERT L; Person Filing: CARGOWAYS LT LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HORN, ROBERT L; Person Filing: DUMONT, GILLES;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HORN, ROBERT L; Person Filing: GRANER, CHRIS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HORN, ROBERT L; Person Filing: CARGOWAYS LOGISTICS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HORN, ROBERT L; Person Filing: TEXAS CARGOWAYS (A SUBSIDIARY OF CARGOWAYS LLC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HORN, ROBERT L; Person Filing: CARGOWAYS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Description: WAIVER CITATION; Filing Attorney: HORN, ROBERT L; Person Filing: CARGOWAYS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2016
  • Description: WAIVER CITATION; Filing Attorney: HORN, ROBERT L; Person Filing: GRANER, CHRIS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Description: WAIVER CITATION; Filing Attorney: HORN, ROBERT L; Person Filing: CARGOWAYS LOGISTICS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Description: WAIVER CITATION; Filing Attorney: HORN, ROBERT L; Person Filing: TEXAS CARGOWAYS (A SUBSIDIARY OF CARGOWAYS LLC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 7/26/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STEPHENS, JOSEPH BRENT; Person Filing: SORBENTS MANUFACTURING LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STEPHENS, JOSEPH BRENT; Person Filing: SORBENTS PLUS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STEPHENS, JOSEPH BRENT; Person Filing: SNELL, ANGELA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOWELL, RICHARD T. JR.; Person Filing: FIRST INDUSTRIAL TEXAS LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOWELL, RICHARD T. JR.; Person Filing: FIRST INDUSTRIAL TEXAS LP;

    Read MoreRead Less