Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/01/2021 at 07:19:17 (UTC).

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY vs. SIMPSON, JASON-ANDREW

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SIMPSON, JASON-ANDREW. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is C. ELLIOTT THORNTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1022

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

C. ELLIOTT THORNTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SIMPSON, JASON-ANDREW

Houston, TX 77032

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDANIEL, TIMOTHY M.

 

Court Documents

Return of Service - SIMPSON, JASON-ANDREW

01/20/2021: Return of Service - SIMPSON, JASON-ANDREW

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

01/08/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

EXHIBIT A

01/08/2021: EXHIBIT A

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

01/08/2021: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SIMPSON, JASON-ANDREW; Issued: 1/11/2021; Served: 1/19/2021; Tracking: 73829480; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCDANIEL, TIMOTHY M.; Person Filing: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CORPORATION is a litigant