Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:24:46 (UTC).

FIGURE FOUR PARTNERS LTD vs. NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 FIGURE FOUR PARTNERS LTD filed an Other lawsuit against NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is R. K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1496

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

R. K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIGURE FOUR PARTNERS LTD

Defendants

THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

REBEL CONTRACTORS INC

THE TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA

NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY

DOUBLE OAK CONSTRUCTION INC

TEXASITE LLC

Others

THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA (AN ENTITY) MAY BE SERVED

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY (AN ENTITY) MAY BE SERVED WITH

1701 Directors Boulevard Suite 300

Austin, TX 78744

REBEL CONSTRACTORS INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

TEXASITE LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) CAN BE SERVED BY AND

3486 Country Club Boulevard

Montgomery, TX 77356

THE TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA (AN ENTITY) MAY BE

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

DOUBLE OAK CONSTRUCTION INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED WITH

22731 Fm 2920

Hocklet, TX 77447

REBEL CONTRACTORS INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROOKS, DARIN LEE

1300 Post Oak B

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

Citation (Rebel Contractors Inc)

06/01/2020: Citation (Rebel Contractors Inc)

Citation Corporate (DOUBLE OAK CONSTRUCTION INC)

06/01/2020: Citation Corporate (DOUBLE OAK CONSTRUCTION INC)

Citation (THE TRAVERLERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA)

06/04/2020: Citation (THE TRAVERLERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA)

Citation (THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA)

06/04/2020: Citation (THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA)

Citation (NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY)

06/04/2020: Citation (NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY)

ORDER SIGNED DENYING TRANSFER OF CASE TO ANOTHER DIST COURT

06/05/2020: ORDER SIGNED DENYING TRANSFER OF CASE TO ANOTHER DIST COURT

Citation (The Travelers Property Casualty Company of America)

06/08/2020: Citation (The Travelers Property Casualty Company of America)

Citation (National Trust Insurance Company)

06/08/2020: Citation (National Trust Insurance Company)

Citation (The Travelers Indemnity Company of America)

06/08/2020: Citation (The Travelers Indemnity Company of America)

Affidavit of Service

06/08/2020: Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

06/08/2020: Affidavit of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Letter to Harris County Clerk

05/26/2020: Letter to Harris County Clerk

Exhibit 01

05/26/2020: Exhibit 01

Plaintiff Figure Four Partners LTDS's Original Petition

05/26/2020: Plaintiff Figure Four Partners LTDS's Original Petition

Citation (Double Oak Construction Inc)

05/29/2020: Citation (Double Oak Construction Inc)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED DENYING TRANSFER OF CASE TO ANOTHER DIST COURT; Order Signed: 6/5/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXASITE LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) CAN BE SERVED BY AND; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 6/2/2020; Tracking: 73752905; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: DOUBLE OAK CONSTRUCTION INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED WITH; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73752902; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: REBEL CONTRACTORS INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/28/2020; Tracking: 73752900; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: REBEL CONTRACTORS INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/28/2020; Tracking: 73752900; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: REBEL CONTRACTORS INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/28/2020; Tracking: 73752900; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: REBEL CONTRACTORS INC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/28/2020; Tracking: 73752900; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: THE TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA (AN ENTITY) MAY BE; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73752897; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA (AN ENTITY) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73752893; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NATIONAL TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY (AN ENTITY) MAY BE SERVED WITH; Issued: 5/27/2020; Served: 5/29/2020; Tracking: 73752892; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BROOKS, DARIN LEE; Person Filing: FIGURE FOUR PARTNERS LTD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where DOUBLE OAK CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where National Trust Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Property Casualty Company of America is a litigant