This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/24/2018 at 06:48:35 (UTC).

FFC ACQUISITIONS CO LLC ({DBA FUNERAL FUNDING CENT vs. MILTON, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 01/21/2016 FFC ACQUISITIONS CO LLC DBA FUNERAL FUNDING CENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MILTON, RICHARD. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH J. HALBACH JR and DARYL L. MOORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3749

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

JOSEPH J. HALBACH JR

DARYL L. MOORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FFC ACQUISITIONS CO LLC ({DBA FUNERAL FUNDING CENTER} THROUGH ITS

FUNERAL FUNDING CENTER

Defendants

MILTON, RICHARD

Houston, TX 77088

MILTON, RICHARD VERNON

Not Classified By Court

ODAM, JOHN WILL JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NICKEY, STEPHEN HARRISON

 

Court Documents

Exhibit A

01/21/2016: Exhibit A

Plaintiffs Original Petition

01/21/2016: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Answer

03/03/2016: Answer

Answer

03/03/2016: Answer

Answer

03/03/2016: Answer

Exhibit A

03/16/2016: Exhibit A

Notice of Hearing by Submission of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment

03/16/2016: Notice of Hearing by Submission of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment

Proposed Judgment

03/16/2016: Proposed Judgment

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

03/23/2016: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

Exhibit C

11/11/2016: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

11/11/2016: Exhibit B

FFC Acquisitions Co. LLC d/b/a Funeral Funding Center's Traditional Motion for Summary Judgment and motion for Judgment Nihil Dicit

11/11/2016: FFC Acquisitions Co. LLC d/b/a Funeral Funding Center's Traditional Motion for Summary Judgment and motion for Judgment Nihil Dicit

Proposed Summary Judgment Order

11/18/2016: Proposed Summary Judgment Order

Notice Of Hearing Date

11/18/2016: Notice Of Hearing Date

Request For Abstract

12/16/2016: Request For Abstract

Motion For New Trial

12/28/2016: Motion For New Trial

Request for Execution

06/27/2017: Request for Execution

Writ of Execution

10/04/2017: Writ of Execution

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2016
  • Description: MOTION NEW TRIAL; Person Filing: MILTON, RICHARD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Description: FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED; Order Signed: 12/9/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Description: DEFENDANT COSTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; Order Signed: 11/2/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: MILTON, RICHARD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: NICKEY, STEPHEN HARRISON; Person Filing: FUNERAL FUNDING CENTER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: NICKEY, STEPHEN HARRISON; Person Filing: FFC ACQUISITIONS CO LLC ({DBA FUNERAL FUNDING CENTER} THROUGH ITS;

    Read MoreRead Less