This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:04:15 (UTC).

FERRANDO, TRACY vs. FERRANDO, ARNOLD ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 FERRANDO, TRACY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FERRANDO, ARNOLD ANTHONY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8015

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERRANDO, TRACY

Defendant

FERRANDO, ARNOLD ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES, ALLISON HUGHES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2005
  • ORDER GRANTING ENTRY OF NUNC PRO TUNC SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING AGREEMENT PER RULE 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JONES, ALLISON HUGHES Person Filing - FERRANDO, TRACY

    Read MoreRead Less