Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:32:12 (UTC).

FALL CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. LEE, RICHARD E

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 FALL CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LEE, RICHARD E. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9407

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FALL CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendant

LEE, RICHARD E

Humble, TX 77396

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAINES, JAMES PAUL

2800 Post Oak B

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order for Service Under Rule 106, TRCP

05/21/2020: Proposed Order for Service Under Rule 106, TRCP

Motion for Service Under Rule 106, TRCP

05/21/2020: Motion for Service Under Rule 106, TRCP

ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

05/27/2020: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED

Exhibit A

03/26/2020: Exhibit A

Civil Process Request Form

03/26/2020: Civil Process Request Form

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Requests for Disclosure

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Requests for Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/27/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2020
  • HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Submission Docket (Local Rule 12); Reason: SUBSTITUTED SERVICE - MOTION FOR (TRCP 106); Results: Granted; Comments: O/S 5/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LEE, RICHARD E; Issued: 3/27/2020; Tracking: 73738548; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GAINES, JAMES PAUL; Person Filing: FALL CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FALL CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant