Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:48:01 (UTC).

FAIRFIELD INWOOD PARK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION INC vs. BOSTICK, ANDREW

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 FAIRFIELD INWOOD PARK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other lawsuit against BOSTICK, ANDREW. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DEDRA DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9560

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DEDRA DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FAIRFIELD INWOOD PARK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION, IN

FAIRFIELD INWOOD PARK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION INC

Defendant

BOSTICK, ANDREW

Cypress, TX 77433

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAMISON, JOHN C

JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.

 

Court Documents

Citation

04/29/2020: Citation

Civil Process Request

03/26/2020: Civil Process Request

Civil Case Information Sheet

03/26/2020: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiff's Original Petition

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BOSTICK, ANDREW; Issued: 3/31/2020; Served: 4/25/2020; Tracking: 73739563; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.; Person Filing: FAIRFIELD INWOOD PARK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION INC;

    Read MoreRead Less