This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/16/2022 at 23:28:11 (UTC).

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION vs. LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL GOMEZ and RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3044

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MICHAEL GOMEZ

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

Defendants

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC

LANDMARK PETROLEUM LLC

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS LTD

SHELL RETAIL AND CONVENIENCE OPERATIONS LLC

Others

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) CAN BE

11111 Wilcrest Green Drive Suite 100

Houston, TX 77042

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) CAN

11111 Wilcrest Green Drive Suite 100

Houston, TX 77042

LANDMARK PETROLEUM LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) CAN

11111 Wilcrest Green Drive Suite 100

Houston, TX 77042

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS LTD (TEXAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP) CAN

11111 Wilcrest Green Drive Suite 100

Houston, TX 77042

SHELL RETAIL AND CONVENIENCE OPERATIONS LLC (DELAWARE LIMITED

1999 Bryan St Sutie 900

Dallas, TX 75201

ANY AND ALL INTERESTED PARTIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REED, NOELLE MARIE

Defendant Attorneys

CARBO, CHARLES LARRY III

SHIPLEY, GEORGE THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Defendants' Original Answer and Defenses

01/24/2022: Defendants' Original Answer and Defenses

Proposed Order Unopposed Motion to Temporarily Seal Court Records

01/24/2022: Proposed Order Unopposed Motion to Temporarily Seal Court Records

Unopposed Motion to Seal

01/24/2022: Unopposed Motion to Seal

Notice of Oral Hearing

01/24/2022: Notice of Oral Hearing

ORDER SIGNED RECUSING JUDGE

01/24/2022: ORDER SIGNED RECUSING JUDGE

Amended Notice of Hearing

02/02/2022: Amended Notice of Hearing

Exhibit A - Declaration of J. Kent Brotherton

02/07/2022: Exhibit A - Declaration of J. Kent Brotherton

Landmark Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Amended Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

02/07/2022: Landmark Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Amended Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

Second Amended Notice of Oral Hearing

02/07/2022: Second Amended Notice of Oral Hearing

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

02/07/2022: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

ExxonMobil Oil Corporation's Verified Second Amended Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

02/07/2022: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation's Verified Second Amended Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

Letter from Court of Appeals

02/08/2022: Letter from Court of Appeals

Proposed Order Denying Temporary Restraining Order

02/08/2022: Proposed Order Denying Temporary Restraining Order

ORDER SIGNED DENYING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

02/08/2022: ORDER SIGNED DENYING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Notice of Oral Hearing on Application for Temporary Injunction

03/04/2022: Notice of Oral Hearing on Application for Temporary Injunction

SHELL RETAIL AND CONVENIENCE OPERATIONS LLCs COUNTERCLAIM AGAINST EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

03/04/2022: SHELL RETAIL AND CONVENIENCE OPERATIONS LLCs COUNTERCLAIM AGAINST EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

Memorandum Opinion (First Court of Appeals)

03/08/2022: Memorandum Opinion (First Court of Appeals)

Notice of Oral Hearing

03/11/2022: Notice of Oral Hearing

116 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • HearingCourt: 113; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR); Results: Case Settled; Comments: SETTLEMENT ANNOUNCED 4/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • HearingCourt: 113; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (MOTION TO) (TRCP 165A); Results: Passed; Comments: CASE DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • HearingCourt: 113; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: SEAL DOCUMENTS (MOTION TO); Requesting Party: CARBO, CHARLES LARRY III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION BY POSTING (CIVIL); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Person: ANY AND ALL INTERESTED PARTIES; Issued: 4/29/2022; Tracking: 74001101; Deliver To: CONST 1 ALAN ROSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 4/28/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 4/27/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • HearingCourt: 113; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: DISMISS (MOTION TO); Results: Heard (No Ruling Made); Requesting Party: HAMPTON, WALLIS MIZELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • HearingCourt: 113; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: QUASH DEPOSITIONS (MOTION TO) (TRCP 186B); Results: Heard (No Ruling Made); Requesting Party: REED, NOELLE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • HearingCourt: 113; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION (MOTION FOR); Results: Heard (No Ruling Made); Requesting Party: REED, NOELLE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED RECUSING JUDGE; Order Signed: 1/20/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT(S) SIGNED; Order Signed: 12/29/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • HearingCourt: 334; Docket Type: Ancillary Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (MOTION FOR); Results: Hearing Held; Comments: AGREEMENT ON THE RECORD; Requesting Party: REED, NOELLE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SHIPLEY, GEORGE THOMAS; Person Filing: SHELL RETAIL AND CONVENIENCE OPERATIONS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SHELL RETAIL AND CONVENIENCE OPERATIONS LLC (DELAWARE LIMITED; Issued: 12/29/2021; Tracking: 73955769; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS LTD (TEXAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP) CAN; Issued: 12/29/2021; Tracking: 73955768; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK PETROLEUM LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) CAN; Issued: 12/29/2021; Tracking: 73955767; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) CAN; Issued: 12/29/2021; Tracking: 73955766; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC (TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) CAN BE; Issued: 12/29/2021; Tracking: 73955765; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REED, NOELLE MARIE; Person Filing: EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A is a litigant

Latest cases where ExxonMobil Oil Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIPLEY, GEORGE THOMAS