This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/04/2022 at 07:20:10 (UTC).

ESS STORAGE ACQUISITION FORTY ONE LLC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 ESS STORAGE ACQUISITION FORTY ONE LLC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DEDRA DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8141

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DEDRA DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESS STORAGE ACQUISITION FORTY ONE LLC

BRITTMOORE SS INVESTMENT LLC

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS CHIEF

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs' Original Petition

05/11/2022: Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Return of Service

05/20/2022: Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS CHIEF; Issued: 5/12/2022; Served: 5/19/2022; Received: 5/20/2022; Tracking: 74004983; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE; Person Filing: BRITTMOORE SS INVESTMENT LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE; Person Filing: ESS STORAGE ACQUISITION FORTY ONE LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHEEK, LYNDSEY MICHELLE