This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:38:31 (UTC).

ESPINOSA, JESSE vs. HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PCT. 5

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 ESPINOSA, JESSE filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PCT 5. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1737

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESPINOSA, JESSE

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY - CRIME RECORDS SERVICE MSC 0234

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PCT. 5

17423 Katy Fwy

Houston, TX 77094

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PCT. 4

6831 Cypresswood Dr.,

Spring, TX 77379

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES

OCA-EXPUNCTION

205 W. 14Th St.,

Austin, TX 78701

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

1310 Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES BY SERVING

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTINEZ, HERMAN

2617 Canal St.

Houston, TX 77003

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • HearingCourt: 269; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OCA-EXPUNCTION; Issued: 6/5/2020; Tracking: 73755729; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PCT. 4; Issued: 6/5/2020; Tracking: 73755728; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PCT. 5; Issued: 6/5/2020; Tracking: 73755726; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES BY SERVING; Issued: 6/5/2020; Tracking: 73754661; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/5/2020; Tracking: 73754660; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE; Issued: 6/5/2020; Tracking: 73754658; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/5/2020; Tracking: 73754657; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 6/5/2020; Tracking: 73754655; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 6/1/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 6/1/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MARTINEZ, HERMAN; Person Filing: ESPINOSA, JESSE;

    Read MoreRead Less