This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/09/2022 at 07:18:56 (UTC).

EOG RESOURCES INC vs. MIDESSA CONSULTING LLC

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 EOG RESOURCES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIDESSA CONSULTING LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9078

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EOG RESOURCES INC

Defendant

MIDESSA CONSULTING LLC

Other

MIDESSA CONSULTING LLC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

5904 Dog Leg Ct

Granbury, TX 76049

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLEMI, MICHAEL ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff EOG Resources Inc's Original Petition

05/16/2022: Plaintiff EOG Resources Inc's Original Petition

Exhibit A

05/16/2022: Exhibit A

Exhibit B

05/16/2022: Exhibit B

Exhibit C

05/16/2022: Exhibit C

Exhibit D

05/16/2022: Exhibit D

Exhibit E

05/16/2022: Exhibit E

Exhibit F

05/16/2022: Exhibit F

Exhibit G

05/16/2022: Exhibit G

Exhibit H

05/16/2022: Exhibit H

Exhibit I

05/16/2022: Exhibit I

Request for Issuance of Service

05/16/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Return of Service

06/02/2022: Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MIDESSA CONSULTING LLC (TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 5/17/2022; Served: 5/28/2022; Received: 6/2/2022; Tracking: 74006128; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GOLEMI, MICHAEL ANTHONY; Person Filing: EOG RESOURCES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EOG RESOURCES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLEMI, MICHAEL ANTHONY