This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/11/2021 at 08:01:09 (UTC).

EOG RESOURCES INC vs. MIDESSA CONSULTING LLC

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 EOG RESOURCES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIDESSA CONSULTING LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0292

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EOG RESOURCES INC

Defendant

MIDESSA CONSULTING LLC

Other

MIDESSA CONSULTING LLC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY

5904 Dog Leg Ct

Granbury, TX 76049

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLEMI, MICHAEL ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff EOG Resources, Inc.'s original petition

09/17/2021: Plaintiff EOG Resources, Inc.'s original petition

Exhibit A

09/17/2021: Exhibit A

Exhibit B

09/17/2021: Exhibit B

Exhibit C

09/17/2021: Exhibit C

Exhibit D

09/17/2021: Exhibit D

Exhibit E

09/17/2021: Exhibit E

Request for Issuance of Service

09/17/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Citation

10/06/2021: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MIDESSA CONSULTING LLC (A TEXAS CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY; Issued: 9/20/2021; Served: 10/1/2021; Received: 10/6/2021; Tracking: 73917990; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GOLEMI, MICHAEL ANTHONY; Person Filing: EOG RESOURCES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EOG RESOURCES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLEMI, MICHAEL ANTHONY