This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/11/2021 at 08:00:39 (UTC).

EOG RESOURCES INC vs. L&C SAFETY INC (D/B/A STANDARD SAFETY AND SUPPLY)

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 EOG RESOURCES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against L C SAFETY INC D/B/A STANDARD SAFETY AND SUPPLY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA ROTH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0289

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA ROTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EOG RESOURCES INC

Defendants

L&C SAFETY INC (D/B/A STANDARD SAFETY AND SUPPLY)

STANDARD SAFETY AND SUPPLY

ACUITY (A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY)

NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES LLC

Others

EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

L&C SAFETY INC (D/B/A STANDARD SAFETY AND SUPPLY) (A TEXAS

7101 N Cr West

Odessa, TX 79764

ACUITY (A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

2800 S Taylor Dr

Sheboygan, WI 53081

NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

1201 Peachtree Street N E

Atlanta, GA 30316

ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY MAY BE SERVED

1108 E South Union Avenue

Midvale, UT 84047

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLEMI, MICHAEL ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff EOG Resources, Inc.'s Original Petition

09/17/2021: Plaintiff EOG Resources, Inc.'s Original Petition

CPR - Acuity

09/17/2021: CPR - Acuity

CPR - Endurance

09/17/2021: CPR - Endurance

CPR - Evolution

09/17/2021: CPR - Evolution

CPR - L&C

09/17/2021: CPR - L&C

CPR - Navigators

09/17/2021: CPR - Navigators

Exhibit A

09/17/2021: Exhibit A

Exhibit B

09/17/2021: Exhibit B

Exhibit C

09/17/2021: Exhibit C

Exhibit D

09/17/2021: Exhibit D

Citation - Non Resident

10/06/2021: Citation - Non Resident

Citation

10/01/2021: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73917914; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73917912; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ACUITY (A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73917909; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: L&C SAFETY INC (D/B/A STANDARD SAFETY AND SUPPLY) (A TEXAS; Issued: 9/20/2021; Tracking: 73917866; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 9/20/2021; Served: 9/24/2021; Tracking: 73917864; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GOLEMI, MICHAEL ANTHONY; Person Filing: EOG RESOURCES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVOLUTION WELL SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EOG RESOURCES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where NAVIGATORS SPECIALTY INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Acuity is a litigant