This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/04/2020 at 08:57:57 (UTC).

ENTERPRISE HOUSTON SHIP CHANNEL L P vs. LUKOIL PAN AMERICAS LLC

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 ENTERPRISE HOUSTON SHIP CHANNEL L P filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUKOIL PAN AMERICAS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA ROTH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8810

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA ROTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENTERPRISE HOUSTON SHIP CHANNEL L P

Defendant

LUKOIL PAN AMERICAS LLC

Other

LUKOIL PAN AMERICAS LLC (DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STAFFORD, CODY WAYNE

 

Court Documents

Return of Service- Lukoil Pan Americas LLC

05/14/2020: Return of Service- Lukoil Pan Americas LLC

Ltr to Court re Citation

05/12/2020: Ltr to Court re Citation

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

05/11/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

Exhibit 01

05/11/2020: Exhibit 01

Exhibit 02

05/11/2020: Exhibit 02

Exhibit 03

05/11/2020: Exhibit 03

Exhibit 04

05/11/2020: Exhibit 04

Exhibit 05

05/11/2020: Exhibit 05

Exhibit 06

05/11/2020: Exhibit 06

Exhibit 07

05/11/2020: Exhibit 07

Exhibit 08

05/11/2020: Exhibit 08

Exhibit 09

05/11/2020: Exhibit 09

Exhibit 10

05/11/2020: Exhibit 10

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LUKOIL PAN AMERICAS LLC (DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE; Issued: 5/12/2020; Served: 5/13/2020; Tracking: 73749480; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STAFFORD, CODY WAYNE; Person Filing: ENTERPRISE HOUSTON SHIP CHANNEL L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE HOUSTON SHIP CHANNEL LP is a litigant

Latest cases where LUKOIL PAN AMERICAS, LLC is a litigant