This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/12/2021 at 13:50:37 (UTC).

EMERSON, JOHN vs. PACKERS PLUS ENERGY SERVICES (USA INC)

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 EMERSON, JOHN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PACKERS PLUS ENERGY SERVICES USA INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7356

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMERSON, JOHN

Defendant

PACKERS PLUS ENERGY SERVICES (USA INC)

Other

PACKERS PLUS ENERGY SERVICES (USA INC) (CORPORATION) BY SERVING

5051 Westheimer Road Ste 1000

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG, GREGG M.

Defendant Attorney

SPALDING, JAMES BRADLEY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

10/10/2017: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

10/10/2017: CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

10/10/2017: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

10/12/2017: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Citation Corporate

10/27/2017: Citation Corporate

Defendants Original Answer to Plaintiffs Original Petition

11/17/2017: Defendants Original Answer to Plaintiffs Original Petition

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

11/29/2017: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Defendants First Amended Answer to Plaintiffs Original Petition

04/02/2018: Defendants First Amended Answer to Plaintiffs Original Petition

Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion for Complete Summary Judgment

04/05/2018: Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion for Complete Summary Judgment

Notice of Oral Hearing on Defendants Motion for Complete Summary Judgment

04/05/2018: Notice of Oral Hearing on Defendants Motion for Complete Summary Judgment

Exhibit C

04/05/2018: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

04/05/2018: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

04/05/2018: Exhibit A

Defendants Motion for Complete Summary Judgment

04/05/2018: Defendants Motion for Complete Summary Judgment

Plaintiffs First Amended Petition

05/01/2018: Plaintiffs First Amended Petition

Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

05/04/2018: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

Exhibit A

05/15/2018: Exhibit A

Defendants Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal

05/15/2018: Defendants Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Passed; Comments: CASE REMOVED TO FED CRT 5/15/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketDescription: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: SUMMARY JUDGMENT-FINAL (MOTION FOR) (TRCP 166A); Results: Passed; Comments: ATTY HIMSELF 5/4; Requesting Party: SPRAGUE, JONATHAN ANDREW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROSENBERG, GREGG M.; Person Filing: EMERSON, JOHN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROSENBERG, GREGG M.; Person Filing: EMERSON, JOHN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SPALDING, JAMES BRADLEY; Person Filing: PACKERS PLUS ENERGY SERVICES (USA INC);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 11/29/2017;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SPALDING, JAMES BRADLEY; Person Filing: PACKERS PLUS ENERGY SERVICES (USA INC);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PACKERS PLUS ENERGY SERVICES (USA INC) (CORPORATION) BY SERVING; Issued: 10/12/2017; Served: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/31/2017; Tracking: 73423539; Deliver To: CIV AGCY-CIVILIAN SERVICE AGENCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROSENBERG, GREGG M.; Person Filing: EMERSON, JOHN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Packers Plus Energy Services (USA), Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPALDING, JAMES BRADLEY