This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/18/2023 at 05:53:30 (UTC).

ELLIS COUNTY vs. PURDUE PHARMA L P

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 ELLIS COUNTY filed an Other lawsuit against PURDUE PHARMA L P. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1572

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Defendants

ABBOTT LABORATORIES

MCKESSON CORPORATION

WALGREEN CO

ACTAVIS PHARMA INC (F/K/A ACTAVIS INC)

PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L P

MALLINCKRODT LLC

MALLINCKRODT PLC

WATSON PHARMA INC

THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY INC

ABBVIE INC

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC

CEPHALON INC

COVIDIEN PLC

ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC

ACTAVIS LLC

ACTAVIS PLC

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC (N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC)

WALGREENS BOOT ALLIANCE INC (A/K/A WALGREEN CO)

CARDINAL HEALTH 414 LLC

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ERTAS, ALPER T.

SMYSER, CRAIG

PATTERSON, NANCY L.

SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO

MENGIS, MICHAEL W.

Other Attorneys

PERRY, CHARLES STANTON

MCCARLEY, MATTHEW RYAN

WEINSTEIN, DAVID B.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial

11/09/2022: Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial

Plaintiffs Motion for New Trial

10/28/2022: Plaintiffs Motion for New Trial

Exhibit A

05/16/2022: Exhibit A

Defendant CVS Health Corporation Special Appearance and Original Answer

05/16/2022: Defendant CVS Health Corporation Special Appearance and Original Answer

Proposed Order

09/30/2022: Proposed Order

Stipulation and (Proposed) Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of the Distributor Defendants

09/30/2022: Stipulation and (Proposed) Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of the Distributor Defendants

PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

10/04/2022: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

10/07/2022: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

Mckesson Corporation And Mckesson Medical Surgical, Inc's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition

06/21/2019: Mckesson Corporation And Mckesson Medical Surgical, Inc's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition

Abbott Laboratories Answer to Plaintiffs Original Petition

06/24/2019: Abbott Laboratories Answer to Plaintiffs Original Petition

Defendant Cephalon, Inc.'s Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition

06/24/2019: Defendant Cephalon, Inc.'s Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition

Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Original Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition

06/24/2019: Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Original Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition

Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. F/K/A Watson Pharma, Inc. And Watson Laboratories, Inc's original answer And Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition

06/24/2019: Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. F/K/A Watson Pharma, Inc. And Watson Laboratories, Inc's original answer And Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition

Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

06/24/2019: Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

Request For Inssurance of Service

06/25/2019: Request For Inssurance of Service

Ellis County ISSUSANCE OF MISSING CITATIONS 6.25.19

06/25/2019: Ellis County ISSUSANCE OF MISSING CITATIONS 6.25.19

Appendix F

06/17/2019: Appendix F

Appendix E

06/17/2019: Appendix E

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: MOTION NEW TRIAL; Filing Attorney: MCCARLEY, MATTHEW RYAN; Person Filing: ELLIS COUNTY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES; Order Signed: 10/7/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION; Order Signed: 10/4/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 7/7/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES; Order Signed: 7/7/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEINSTEIN, DAVID B.; Person Filing: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO; Person Filing: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PATTERSON, NANCY L.; Person Filing: CEPHALON INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO; Person Filing: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PATTERSON, NANCY L.; Person Filing: WATSON LABORATORIES INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ERTAS, ALPER T.; Person Filing: ABBOTT LABORATORIES;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PATTERSON, NANCY L.; Person Filing: ACTAVIS LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SMYSER, CRAIG; Person Filing: MCKESSON CORPORATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SMYSER, CRAIG; Person Filing: MCKESSON MEDICAL SURGICAL INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PERRY, CHARLES STANTON; Person Filing: AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MENGIS, MICHAEL W.; Person Filing: CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MENGIS, MICHAEL W.; Person Filing: CARDINAL HEALTH 200 LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MENGIS, MICHAEL W.; Person Filing: CARDINAL HEALTH 414 LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MENGIS, MICHAEL W.; Person Filing: CARDINAL HEALTH INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCARLEY, MATTHEW RYAN; Person Filing: ELLIS COUNTY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less