This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/09/2021 at 07:27:38 (UTC).

ELDRIDGE, TOJUNA NICOLE vs. CISNEROS, ADALBERTO

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 ELDRIDGE, TOJUNA NICOLE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CISNEROS, ADALBERTO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3148

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELDRIDGE, TOJUNA NICOLE

GREEN, MAJORIE DAIANA

GLOVER, DANIEL DEANDRE

Defendants

CISNEROS, ADALBERTO

Katy, TX 77449

FEDEX FREIGHT INC

Other

FEDEX FREIGHT INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY

1999 Bryan St Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORTEGUERA, JOSEPH RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Request for Issuance of Service

07/16/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

07/16/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Plaintiffs Original Petition and Jury Demand

07/16/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition and Jury Demand

Citation Corporate Return

07/21/2021: Citation Corporate Return

Citation Return

07/22/2021: Citation Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CISNEROS, ADALBERTO; Issued: 7/19/2021; Served: 7/21/2021; Tracking: 73892233; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FEDEX FREIGHT INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY; Issued: 7/16/2021; Served: 7/20/2021; Tracking: 73891772; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CORTEGUERA, JOSEPH RICHARD; Person Filing: GREEN, MAJORIE DAIANA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CORTEGUERA, JOSEPH RICHARD; Person Filing: GLOVER, DANIEL DEANDRE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CORTEGUERA, JOSEPH RICHARD; Person Filing: ELDRIDGE, TOJUNA NICOLE;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FedEx Freight, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph R. Corteguera