This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:14:51 (UTC).

EL HAJABDULMAJID, KHALED vs. VELASQUEZ, ELIZABETH SANTOS

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 EL HAJABDULMAJID, KHALED filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VELASQUEZ, ELIZABETH SANTOS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0654

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EL HAJABDULMAJID, KHALED

Defendant

VELASQUEZ, ELIZABETH SANTOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REVIER, D. R.

Defendant Attorney

ENOCHS, TAMMI J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2005
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ENOCHS, TAMMI J Person Filing - VELASQUEZ, ELIZABETH SANTOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - REVIER, D. R. Person Filing - EL HAJABDULMAJID, KHALED

    Read MoreRead Less