This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:28:16 (UTC).

EDWARDS, ROLAND vs. TEXACO INC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 EDWARDS, ROLAND filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against TEXACO INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8704

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARDS, ROLAND

Defendants

AIR LIQUIDEE AMERICA CORP

ALLIED CHEMCAL CORP

ALLIEDSIGNAL INC

AMERIPOL SYNPOL CORP

AMOCO CHEMICAL CO

AMOCO OIL CO

ARCO CHEMICAL CO

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO

B A S F CORP

B F GOODRICH CORP

B P OIL CORP

B P GOODRICH CORP

B P EXPLORATION & OIL INC

BASIS PETROLEUM INC

BEAZER EAST INC

BEAZER MATERIALS & SERVICES INC

BIG THREE INDUSTRIES INC

CANADIANOXY OFFSHORE PRODUCTION CO

CHAMPION INTERNATIONAL CORP

61 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP

Defendant Attorney

KROGER, BILL

Other Attorneys

ELLISTON, GARY D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2007
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - MOBIL CHEMICAL CO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - MOBILE OIL REFINING CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • FIFTEENTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP Person Filing - EDWARDS, ROLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP Person Filing - EDWARDS, ROLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP Person Filing - EDWARDS, ROLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GIBLIN, AARYN KEMP Person Filing - EDWARDS, ROLAND

    Read MoreRead Less