This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 07:31:08 (UTC).

EDGEWATER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC vs. WASHINGTON, JEZREEL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 EDGEWATER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other lawsuit against WASHINGTON, JEZREEL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0104

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDGEWATER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

WASHINGTON, JEZREEL

Webster, TX 77598

WASHINGTON, BRANDY A

Webster, TX 77598

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

07/20/2020: Affidavit of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

07/07/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Civil Case Information Sheet

07/07/2020: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiffs Original Petition

07/07/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WASHINGTON, BRANDY A; Issued: 7/8/2020; Served: 7/15/2020; Tracking: 73764745; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WASHINGTON, JEZREEL; Issued: 7/8/2020; Tracking: 73764743; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JAMISON, JOHN CARL JR.; Person Filing: EDGEWATER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC;

    Read MoreRead Less