This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:43:30 (UTC).

EAST FRWY 12322 LTD (AS THE PROPERTY OWN vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 EAST FRWY 12322 LTD AS THE PROPERTY OWN filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7395

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EAST FRWY 12322 LTD (AS THE PROPERTY OWNERS)

PROPERTY OWNERS

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD OF HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKENNEY, HUGH L.

Defendant Attorney

STEWART, G. TODD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2006
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2006
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STEWART, G. TODD Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKENNEY, HUGH L. Person Filing - PROPERTY OWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKENNEY, HUGH L. Person Filing - EAST FRWY 12322 LTD (AS THE PROPERTY OWNERS)

    Read MoreRead Less