This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/14/2019 at 07:22:17 (UTC).

EAGLE RESTORE LLC vs. NUNEZ, ALVARO (JR)

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 EAGLE RESTORE LLC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against NUNEZ, ALVARO JR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0591

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

EAGLE RESTORE LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FLURRY, RONALD DALE

Fort Worth, TX 76137

NUNEZ, LISA

Fort Worth, TX 76179

NUNEZ, ALVARO (JR)

Fort Worth, TX 77375

A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL, JAMES "MITCH"

25700 Interestat

Spring, TX 77386

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVENPORT, J. KENT

700 N. Pearl S

Dallas, TX 75201

EPSTEIN, LEONARD A.

12201 Merit

Dallas, TX 75254

HECHT, NATHAN L.

 

Court Documents

Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

03/22/2019: Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

Exhibits

03/28/2019: Exhibits

Defendants' Answer To The Honorable Judge Of Said Court

03/28/2019: Defendants' Answer To The Honorable Judge Of Said Court

Request for Emergency 680 TRO dissolution hearing

03/29/2019: Request for Emergency 680 TRO dissolution hearing

Order Denying Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order

04/01/2019: Order Denying Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order

Plaintiff's Response To Motion To Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order

04/01/2019: Plaintiff's Response To Motion To Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order

Exhibit D

04/01/2019: Exhibit D

Exhibit A-2

04/01/2019: Exhibit A-2

Defendants' Counterclaim

04/01/2019: Defendants' Counterclaim

Agreed Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order

04/02/2019: Agreed Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED

03/21/2019: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order & Order Setting Hearing

03/21/2019: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order & Order Setting Hearing

Exhibit H

03/21/2019: Exhibit H

Exhibit F

03/21/2019: Exhibit F

Exhibit A

03/21/2019: Exhibit A

Request for Issuance of Service

03/22/2019: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/22/2019: Request for Issuance of Service

Verification of Melissa Aldridge

03/22/2019: Verification of Melissa Aldridge

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Description: ORDER DISSOLVING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 4/2/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: DAVENPORT, J. KENT; Person Filing: NUNEZ, ALVARO (JR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: DAVENPORT, J. KENT; Person Filing: NUNEZ, ALVARO (JR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DAVENPORT, J. KENT; Person Filing: FLURRY, RONALD DALE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Description: CROSS ACTION; Filing Attorney: HECHT, NATHAN L.; Person Filing: A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: DAVENPORT, J. KENT; Person Filing: FLURRY, RONALD DALE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: DAVENPORT, J. KENT; Person Filing: FLURRY, RONALD DALE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: DAVENPORT, J. KENT; Person Filing: NUNEZ, LISA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: DAVENPORT, J. KENT; Person Filing: NUNEZ, LISA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EPSTEIN, LEONARD A.; Person Filing: NUNEZ, ALVARO (JR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EPSTEIN, LEONARD A.; Person Filing: NUNEZ, LISA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/21/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 3/21/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 3/21/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MITCHELL, JAMES "MITCH"; Person Filing: EAGLE RESTORE LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Description: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/21/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less