This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/24/2018 at 16:34:35 (UTC).

EAGLE, MIKE vs. KERR CONSTRUCTION LLC

Case Summary

On 03/10/2016 EAGLE, MIKE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KERR CONSTRUCTION LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LARRY WEIMAN. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5747

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LARRY WEIMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EAGLE, LAUREN

Houston, TX 77024

EAGLE, MIKE

Houston, TX 77024

L.E. MINOR

B.E. MINOR

A.E. MINOR

Defendants, Cross Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

STRUTTON PLUMBING COMPANY INC

KERR CONSTRUCTION LLC

SIOUX CHIEF MFG CO INC

Cross Plaintiff

HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (INCORRECTLY NAMED AS HALLMARK

Others

KERR CONSTRUCTION LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

STRUTTON PLUMBING COMPANY INC (CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

SIOUX CHIEF MFG CO INC (CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH THE TEXAS

SIOUX CHIEF MFG CO INC (CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED AT

14940 Thunderbird Road

Kansas City, MO 64147

Not Classified By Court

SHIDLOFSKY, LEE HOWARD

Austin, TX 78731

3Rd Party Defendants

GONZALES, EDUARDO

Houston, TX 77083

HALLMARK SPECIALTY UNDERWRITERS INC (CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS

7550 W Ih-10 Suite 1400

San Antonio, TX 78229

Guardian Ad Litem

VENZKE, JOHN P.

Houston, TX 77266

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SMITH, JEFFREY MANGAS

HOUSE, JOE

2211 Norfolk St

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

WESTCOTT, WILLIAM BENJAMIN

1885 Saint Jame

Houston, TX 77056

PLETCHER, MATTHEW G.

RIGBY, REN PATRICK JR.

5615 Kirby Driv

Houston, TX 77005

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FARMER, WILLIAM DAVID

411 Heimer Roa

San Antoni, TX 78232

Cross Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

BAIRD, KATHRYN NOEL

1885 Saint Jame

Houston, TX 77056

MARTIN, ROBERT R.

1001 Mckinney S

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Exhibit E

10/12/2016: Exhibit E

Defendant Kerr Construction LLCs Responses to All Parties Requests for Disclosure and Expert Witness Designation

10/12/2016: Defendant Kerr Construction LLCs Responses to All Parties Requests for Disclosure and Expert Witness Designation

Exhibit C

10/25/2016: Exhibit C

Exhibit M

11/03/2016: Exhibit M

Exhibit I

11/03/2016: Exhibit I

Exhibit F

11/03/2016: Exhibit F

Notice of Oral Hearing

11/29/2016: Notice of Oral Hearing

Plaintiffs' Second Amended Petition

12/09/2016: Plaintiffs' Second Amended Petition

Exhibit D

03/22/2017: Exhibit D

Notice of Intent to Rely on Documents Produced

03/29/2017: Notice of Intent to Rely on Documents Produced

Request for Oral Hearing

03/31/2017: Request for Oral Hearing

Notice of Delivery

07/19/2017: Notice of Delivery

Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions - REDACTED

12/29/2017: Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions - REDACTED

Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions - REDACTED

12/29/2017: Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions - REDACTED

Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions

04/17/2018: Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions

Exhibit G

08/20/2018: Exhibit G

Notice of Delivery

09/11/2018: Notice of Delivery

Exhibit C

09/25/2018: Exhibit C

283 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • Description: NINTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOUSE, JOE; Person Filing: B.E. MINOR;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Description: NINTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOUSE, JOE; Person Filing: A.E. MINOR;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Description: NINTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOUSE, JOE; Person Filing: L.E. MINOR;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Description: NINTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOUSE, JOE; Person Filing: EAGLE, LAUREN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Description: NINTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOUSE, JOE; Person Filing: EAGLE, MIKE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE; Order Signed: 9/28/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Description: ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE PLEADING SIGNED; Order Signed: 9/28/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Description: SENSITIVE DATA INCLUDED IN DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 9/24/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Description: ORDER TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM GRANTED; Order Signed: 9/24/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Description: EIGHTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOUSE, JOE; Person Filing: EAGLE, MIKE;

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DANIELS, DOUGLAS A.; Person Filing: EAGLE, MIKE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/26/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PLETCHER, MATTHEW G.; Person Filing: KERR CONSTRUCTION LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WESTCOTT, WILLIAM BENJAMIN; Person Filing: STRUTTON PLUMBING COMPANY INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SMITH, JEFFREY MANGAS; Person Filing: EAGLE, LAUREN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SMITH, JEFFREY MANGAS; Person Filing: EAGLE, MIKE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Description: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 6/21/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less