This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/28/2021 at 08:17:18 (UTC).

DRDA PLLC vs. O'NEAL, THOMAS MICHAEL (AKA THOMAS MICKEY ONEAL CPA AND MICKEY ONEAL)

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 DRDA PLLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against O'NEAL, THOMAS MICHAEL AKA THOMAS MICKEY ONEAL CPA AND MICKEY ONEAL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4623

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DRDA PLLC

Defendants

O'NEAL, THOMAS MICHAEL (AKA THOMAS MICKEY ONEAL CPA AND MICKEY ONEAL)

Kingwood, TX 77339

DEGEORGE, DONN

Houston, TX 77059

ONEALCPA PLLC

EXPONENTIAL EQUATIONS LLC

DANIELS, LEE

Cypress, TX 77433

WHITE RHINO BUSINESS

ONEAL, THOMAS MICKEY (CPA)

ONEAL, MICKEY

Others

ONEAL CPA PLLC (IS A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

12 Greens Edge Drive

Kingwood, TX 77339

EXPONENTIAL EQUATIONS PLLC (IS A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

16702 Aston Main Dr

Cypress, TX 77433

WHITE RHINO BUSINESS (IS A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

3040 Poak Oak Blvd Suite 1140

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG, GREGG M.

Defendant Attorney

MCFARLAND, JOHN HATCHETT

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY SIGNED

10/11/2021: ORDER GRANTING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY SIGNED

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

10/11/2021: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

Letter paying Bond Fee

10/12/2021: Letter paying Bond Fee

Proposed Amended Temporary Restraining Order

10/12/2021: Proposed Amended Temporary Restraining Order

ORDER MODIFYING AND AMENDING TEMPORARY ORDERS SIGNED

10/13/2021: ORDER MODIFYING AND AMENDING TEMPORARY ORDERS SIGNED

Letter

10/14/2021: Letter

Envelope

10/14/2021: Envelope

Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

10/14/2021: Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

Proposed Order Extending TRO and Resetting Temporary Injunction Hearing

10/19/2021: Proposed Order Extending TRO and Resetting Temporary Injunction Hearing

Motion To Enter Agreed Order Extending TRO And Resetting Temporary Injunction Hearing

10/19/2021: Motion To Enter Agreed Order Extending TRO And Resetting Temporary Injunction Hearing

Exhibit A - Unsworn Declaration of Lee Daniels

10/26/2021: Exhibit A - Unsworn Declaration of Lee Daniels

The White Rhino Defendants' Original Answer

10/26/2021: The White Rhino Defendants' Original Answer

Exhibit K

10/04/2021: Exhibit K

Exhibit J

10/04/2021: Exhibit J

Exhibit I

10/04/2021: Exhibit I

Exhibit H

10/04/2021: Exhibit H

Exhibit G

10/04/2021: Exhibit G

Exhibit F

10/04/2021: Exhibit F

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCFARLAND, JOHN HATCHETT; Person Filing: EXPONENTIAL EQUATIONS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCFARLAND, JOHN HATCHETT; Person Filing: WHITE RHINO BUSINESS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCFARLAND, JOHN HATCHETT; Person Filing: DANIELS, LEE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • HearingCourt: 269; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION (MOTION FOR); Results: Re-Set; Comments: AGREED ORDER TO RESET FILED 10/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING ASIDE ORDER; Order Signed: 10/13/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER MODIFYING AND AMENDING TEMPORARY ORDERS SIGNED; Order Signed: 10/13/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • HearingCourt: 129; Docket Type: Ancillary Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (MOTION FOR); Results: Passed; Comments: PER MS. AGUILAR, JACKI; Requesting Party: ROSENBERG, GREGG M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • HearingCourt: 129; Docket Type: Ancillary Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (MOTION FOR); Results: Re-Set; Requesting Party: ROSENBERG, GREGG M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • HearingCourt: 129; Docket Type: Ancillary Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (MOTION FOR); Results: Re-Set; Requesting Party: ROSENBERG, GREGG M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • HearingCourt: 129; Docket Type: Ancillary Docket; Reason: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (MOTION FOR); Results: Hearing Held; Comments: RESET TO 10/07/21; Requesting Party: ROSENBERG, GREGG M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Person: WHITE RHINO BUSINESS (IS A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 10/18/2021; Tracking: 73928809; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Person: DANIELS, LEE; Issued: 10/18/2021; Tracking: 73928807; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Person: EXPONENTIAL EQUATIONS PLLC (IS A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 10/18/2021; Tracking: 73928805; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Person: ONEAL CPA PLLC (IS A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 10/18/2021; Tracking: 73928801; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Person: DEGEORGE, DONN; Issued: 10/18/2021; Tracking: 73928800; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketType of Service: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Person: O'NEAL, THOMAS MICHAEL (AKA THOMAS MICKEY ONEAL CPA AND MICKEY ONEAL); Issued: 10/18/2021; Tracking: 73928788; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROSENBERG, GREGG M.; Person Filing: DRDA PLLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCFARLAND, JOHN HATCHETT